No. 20-807
Title:Bradley LeDure, Petitioner
v.
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Docketed:December 15, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2164)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, et al. filed.
Main Document
Jan 10 2021Certificate of service filed with respect to amici curiae brief of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, et al.
Main Document
Jan 10 2021Certificate of compliance filed with respect to brief amici curiae brief of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, et al. .
Main Document
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 01 2021Waiver of right of respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2021Response Requested. (Due March 10, 2021)
Mar 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 10, 2021 to April 9, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 9, 2021.
Apr 09 2021Brief of respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2021Reply of petitioner Bradley LeDure filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 17 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration of this petition.
Nov 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 15 2021Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, March 28, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Brief of petitioner Bradley LeDure filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Amicus brief of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, et al. not accepted for filing.(Corrected version submitted) (February 09, 2022)
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers-Transportation Division, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Feb 15 2022The record from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Illinois is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 02 2022Brief of respondent Union Pacific Railroad Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Mar 18 2022Reply of petitioner Bradley LeDure filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2022Argued. For petitioner: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.; and Colleen E. Sinzdak, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: J. Scott Ballenger, Washington, D. C.
Apr 28 2022Adjudged to be AFFIRMED by an equally divided Court. Justice Barrett took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. Opinion per curiam.
May 31 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Bradley LeDure
Nelson G. WolffSchlichter Bogard & Denton LLP
100 South Fourth Street
Suite 1200
St. Louis, MO 63102

nwolff@uselaws.com
3146149383
Party name: Bradley LeDure
Attorneys for Respondent
J. Scott Ballenger
    Counsel of Record
555 Eleventh Street, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-0000

jscottballenger@gmail.com
202-701-4925
Party name: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Jonathan Benjmain AmarilioTaft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60601

jamarilio@taftlaw.com
3125274000
Party name: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lawrence Moses Mann
    Counsel of Record
Alper & Mann, PC
9205 Redwood Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20817

mann.larrym@gmail.com
202-298-9191
Party name: Sheet Metal, Air, Rail Transportation Workers, the Brotherhood of Lo
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of Amer. Railroads
425 3rd Street, S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads