No. 20-805
Title:RollinsNelson LTC Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, ex rel. Jane Winters
Docketed:December 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55020)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Donald Umhofer
    Counsel of Record
Spertus Landes & Umhofer, LLP
1990 South Bundy Drive
Suite 705
Los Angeles, CA 90025

matthew@spertuslaw.com
310-826-4700
Party name: Rollinsnelson Ltc Corp., et al.