No. 20-804
Title:Houston Community College System, Petitioner
v.
David Buren Wilson
Docketed:December 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-20237)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 11 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 13, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 13, 2021 to February 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 12, 2021.
Jan 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 12, 2021 to March 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 22, 2021.
Mar 22 2021Brief of respondent David Buren Wilson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 26 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Mar 31 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Mar 31 2021Reply of petitioner Houston Community College System filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 26 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jun 01 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 14, 2021. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 17, 2021.
Jun 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Houston Community College System
Blanket Consent
Jun 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, David Buren Wilson
Blanket Consent
Jul 14 2021Brief of petitioner Houston Community College System filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2021Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Brief amici curiae of The State of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021Amicus brief of AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard A. Morris
    Counsel of Record
Rogers, Morris & Grover, L.L.P.
5718 Westheimer Road, Suite 1200
Houston, TX 77057

rmorris@rmgllp.com
7139606019
Party name: Houston Community College System
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: David Buren Wilson
Other
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges
Gregory E. Ostfeld
    Counsel of Record
Greenbert Traurig, LLP
77 W. Wacker Drive
Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60601

ostfeldg@gtlaw.com
3124765056
Party name: AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The State of Texas, The District of Columbia and Fifteen Additional States
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Meredith Prykryl Walker
    Counsel of Record
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle P.C.
105 Decker Court, Suite 700
Irving, TX 75062

mwalker@wabsa.com
2145748800
Party name: Texas Association of School Boards Legal Assistance Fund, et al.