No. 20-8
Title:Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Robert R. McCormick Foundation, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-3992, 13-3875, 13-4178, 13-4196)
   Decision Date:December 19, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jul 15 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 10, 2020 to August 26, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 26, 2020, for all respondents.
Aug 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Public Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Eleven Bankruptcy Trustees filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4501
Party name: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Philip David Anker
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Philip.Anker@Wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8890
Party name: SAL Equity Trading, GP f/k/a Susquehanna Capital Group and Susquehanna Investment Group
Other
Peter Vincent Marchetti
    Counsel of Record
Thurgood Marshall School of Law
3100 Cleburne Street
Houston, TX 77004

peter_marchetti@hotmail.com
6172703143
Party name: Law Professors
Chun T. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Chun T. Wright PLLC
1775 I Street NW
Suite 1150
Washington, DC 20006

chun@ctwrightlaw.com
202-559-4300
Party name: Eleven Bankruptcy Trustees
Ernest A. Young
    Counsel of Record
3208 Fox Terrace Drive
Apex, NC 27502

young@law.duke.edu
9193607718
Party name: Public Law Scholars