No. 20-796
Vide 20-795
Title:City of New York, Petitioner
v.
Department of Justice, et al.
Docketed:December 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-267, 19-275)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Memorandum of respondents Department of Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
100 Church St.
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Justice, et al.