No. 20-795
Vide 20-796
Title:New York, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Justice, et al.
Docketed:December 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-267, 19-275)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Brief amici curiae of City of Chicago, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2021Memorandum of respondents Department of Justice, et al. filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Justice, et al.
Other
Benna Ruth Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel of the City of Chicago
2 N. LaSalle St., Ste. 580
Chicago, IL 60602

benna.solomon@cityofchicago.org
312.744.7764
Party name: City of Chicago