No. 20-794
Title:Servotronics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Rolls-Royce PLC, et al.
Docketed:December 11, 2020
Linked with 20A127
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1847)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 11, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 11, 2021 to February 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2021Response to motion from petitioner Servotronics, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2021, for all respondents.
Jan 04 2021Application (20A127) for reconsideration of Clerk's action extending the time to file a response to the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main Document
Jan 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution in Support of Petitioner filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2021Response to application (20A127) from respondent The Boeing Company filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Atlanta International Arbitration Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 25 2021Application (20A127) denied by Justice Barrett.
Feb 10 2021Brief of respondents Rolls-Royce, PLC and The Boeing Company in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Feb 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition GRANTED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Stephen R. Stegich III
    Counsel of Record
Condon & Forsyth
7 Times Square, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10036

sstegich@condonlaw.com
9179400272
Party name: Servotronics, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott Payne Martin
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

smartin@perkinscoie.com
2063593600
Party name: The Boeing Company
Other
John B. Pinney
    Counsel of Record
Graydon Head & Ritchey LLP
312 Walnut Street Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

jpinney@graydon.com
513-629-2730
Party name: International Institute for Conflict Prevention & Resolution in Support of Petitioner
Andrew J. Tuck
    Counsel of Record
Alston and Bird LLP
1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

andy.tuck@alston.com
404-881-7134
Party name: Atlanta International Arbitration Society