No. 20-7934
Title:John Patrick Couch, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12653)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 4, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2021 to July 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 7, 2021.
Jul 07 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 31 2021Reply of petitioner John Patrick Couch filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Patrick Couch#14290-003
FCI Forrest City, Low
P.O. Box 7000
Forrest City, AR 72336-7000

Party name: John Patrick Couch
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States