No. 20-782
Title:Raymond Holloway, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:December 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3595)
   Decision Date:January 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2021 to February 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 8, 2021.
Jan 06 2021Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, And Madison Society Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Brief amicus curiae of Montana Shooting Sports Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jan 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 1, 2021.
Jan 28 2021Motion of Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (January 29, 2021)
Feb 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 10, 2021.
Feb 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Neal Goldfarb filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2021Brief of respondents Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 23 2021Reply of petitioner Raymond Holloway, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

jgr@fpchq.org
(916) 378-5785
Party name: Raymond Holloway, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, et al.
Other
Neal Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
1301 Fairmont St., NW
Washington, DC 20009

goldfarbneal@gmail.com
2022627886
Party name: Neal Goldfarb
David T. Hardy
    Counsel of Record
8987 E. Tanque Verde
No. 265
Tucson, AZ 85749

dthardy@mindspring.com
520-749-0241
Party name: Firearms Policy Foundation, California Gun Rights Foundation, Second Amendment Foundation, And Madison Society Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Constitutional Rights Union
Quentin M. Rhoades
    Counsel of Record
Rhoades, Siefert & Erickson P.L.L.C.
430 Ryman Street
Missoula, MT 59802

qmr@montanalawyer.com
406-721-9700
Party name: Raymond Holloway, Jr.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute