No. 20-7805 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Melvin Knight, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:April 20, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(775 CAP)
   Decision Date:November 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 20, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 20, 2021 to July 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2021.
Jul 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 19, 2021 to September 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 17, 2021.
Sep 17 2021Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 28 2021Reply of petitioner Melvin Knight filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Sep 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 04 2021Record Requested.
Oct 12 2021Record received from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District (1 box).
Oct 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marc Alan Bookman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Center for Capital Representation
1315 Walnut Street, Suite 905
Philadelphia, PA 19107

marcbookman12@gmail.com
2157322227
Party name: Melvin Knight
Attorneys for Respondent
John W. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Westmoreland County District Attorney's Office
2 North Main Street, Suite 206
Greensburg, PA 15601

jpeck@co.westmoreland.pa.us
7248303949
Party name: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania