No. 20-772
Title:Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor, Petitioner
v.
Phil Murphy, Governor of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:December 8, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2458, 19-2459)
   Decision Date:June 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2021Waiver of right of respondent Governor of New Jersey to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 13 2021Waiver of right of respondents New Jersey Senate, Senate President Stephen M. Sweeney, New Jersey General Assembly and Assembly Speaker Craig J. Coughlin to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2021Response Requested. (Due March 1, 2021)
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondents Governor of New Jersey, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 16 2021Reply of petitioner Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Waterfront Commission of New York Harbor
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeremy Michael Feigenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Office of the New Jersey Attorney General
25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08625

jeremy.feigenbaum@njoag.gov
(609) 292-4925
Party name: Governor of New Jersey
Leon J. Sokol
    Counsel of Record
Cullen and Dykman LLP
433 Hackensack Avnue
Hackensack, NJ 07601

lsokol@cullenllp.com
2016799994
Party name: New Jersey Senate, Senate President Stephen M. Sweeney, New Jersey General Assembly and Assembly Speaker Craig J. Coughlin