No. 20-7622
Title:Merle Denezpi, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 31, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1213)
   Decision Date:October 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.
Apr 19 2021Response Requested. (Due May 19, 2021)
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2021 to June 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 18, 2021.
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2021 to July 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 19, 2021.
Jul 19 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 05 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theresa M. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
Duncan Earnest LLC
P.O. Box 2769
Santa Fe, NM 87504

teri@duncanearnest.com
5057106586
Party name: Merle Denezpi
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States