No. 20-748
Title:PHI Air Medical, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Texas Mutual Insurance Company, et al.
Docketed:December 1, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(18-0216)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 23 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2020Motion of respondent Texas Department of Insurance, Division of Workers' Compensation to extend the time to file a response from December 31, 2020 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 1, 2021, for all respondents.
Dec 16 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, PHI Air Medical, LLC
Blanket Consent
Dec 30 2020Brief amicus curiae of Air Medical Operators Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Airbus Helicopters, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020Brief amicus curiae of Air Methods Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 1, 2021 to March 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Mar 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 8, 2021 to March 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 23, 2021, for all respondents.
Mar 23 2021Brief of respondent Texas Department of Insurance, Division of Workers’ Compensation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2021Brief of Texas Mutual Insurance Company in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2021Reply of petitioner PHI Air Medical, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/23/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: PHI Air Medical, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
James Michael Loughlin
    Counsel of Record
Stone Loughlin & Swanson, LLP
3508 Far West Blvd., Ste. 200
Austin, TX 78731

jloughlin@slsaustin.com
5123431300
Party name: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, TASB Risk Management Fund, Transportation Insurance Company, Valley Forge Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, and Zenith Insurance Company
Danielle Mary Spinelli
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6901
Party name: Texas Mutual Insurance Company
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
214-995-1838
Party name: Texas Department of Insurance, Division of Workers’ Compensation
Other
Matthew Birk Baumgartner
    Counsel of Record
Armbrust & Brown, PLLC
100 Congress Avenue
Suite 1300
Austin, TX 78701

mbaumgartner@abaustin.com
(512) 435-2308
Party name: Texas Mutual Insurance Company
Christopher Michael Lauvane Jackson
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
555 17th Street, Suite 3200
Denver, CO 80202

cmjackson@hollandhart.com
3032958305
Party name: Air Methods Corporation
George G. Olsen
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Jensen, PLLC
1201 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

ggolsen@wms-jen.com
2026598201
Party name: Air Medical Operators Association
Douglas A. Winthrop
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
3 Embarcadero Center, 10th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

douglas.winthrop@arnoldporter.com
4154713174
Party name: Airbus Helicopters, Inc.