No. 20-74 Vide 20-271, 20-273, 20-414, 20-679, 20-92 | |
Title: | Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner v. Eugene H. Luoma, et al. |
Docketed: | July 27, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-2315) |
Decision Date: | January 17, 2020 Rule 12.4 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 15, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 23 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Aug 24 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Steuben Foods, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 24 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent High 5 Games, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 25 2020 | Brief of respondent Vilox Technologies, LLC in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 25 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Dali Wireless Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 26 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Concert Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 26 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 26 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Sanofi Pasteur Inc. and SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 26 2020 | Memorandum of respondent Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondent Boloro Global Limited in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 26 2020 | Memorandum of respondent VirnetX Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther | |
Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondent Micron Technology, Inc. in support filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondent Sound View Innovations, LLC in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 26 2020 | Memorandum of respondent Rovi Guides, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 26 2020 | Brief of respondents RPM International, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Aug 26 2020 | Response to petition from respondent Comcast Cable Communications, LLC filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Aug 26 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Personalized Media Communications, LLC to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 27 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Supercell Oy to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 27 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Amgen Inc. and Amgen Manufacturing Liited to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 21 2020 | Motion of the United States under Rule 46.2(a) for partial dismissal of the petition for a writ of certiorari only with respect to the judgment of the court of appeal in case Nos. 2018-2156, 2019-1408, and 2019-1485 filed. |
Proof of ServiceMain Document | |
Oct 08 2020 | Motion to dismiss under Rule 46.2 GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed only with respect to the judgment of the Court of Appeals in Image Processing Technologies LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Nos. 2018-2156, 2019-1408, and 2019-1485. |
Nov 17 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. |
Jun 21 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. |
Jun 28 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of United States v. Arthrex, Inc., 594 U. S. ___ (2021). |
Jul 30 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Melanie Lynn Bostwick Counsel of Record | Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP 1152 15th Street NW Washington, DC 20005 mbostwick@orrick.com | 202-339-8483 |
Party name: Micron Technology, Inc. | ||
Michael Raymond Casey Counsel of Record | Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, L.L.P. 1940 Duke Street Alexandria, VA 22314 mcasey@oblon.com | 703-412-6011 |
Party name: Boloro Global Limited | ||
Charles Hardy Davis Counsel of Record | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. 7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850 Bethesda, MD 20814 cdavis@goldsteinrussell.com | 202-362-0636 |
Party name: Dali Wireless Inc. | ||
Grantland Gilbert Drutchas Counsel of Record | McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert and Berghoff LLP 300 South Wacker, Suite 3100 Chicago, IL 60606 drutchas@mbhb.com | 3129132121 |
Party name: RPM International Inc. | ||
Robert P. Greenspoon Counsel of Record | Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC 333 N. Michigan Ave Suite 2700 Chicago, IL 60601 rpg@fg-law.com | 312-551-9500 |
Party name: Vilox Technologies, LLC | ||
Todd Richard Gregorian Counsel of Record | Fenwick & West LLP 555 California Street, 12th Floor San Francisco, CA 94104 tgregorian@fenwick.com | 4158752300 |
Party name: Supercell Oy | ||
John Michael Jakes Counsel of Record | Finnegan, Henderson, et al. 901 New York Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20001-4413 mike.jakes@finnegan.com | 202 408 4045 |
Party name: SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd. | ||
William McGinley Jay Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter, LLP 1900 N Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 WJay@goodwinlaw.com | 2023464190 |
Party name: Concert Pharmaceuticals, Inc. | ||
Michael E. Joffre Counsel of Record | STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C. 1100 New York Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20005 mjoffre@sternekessler.com | 202-772-8856 |
Party name: Rovi Guides, Inc. | ||
Peter Curtis Magic Counsel of Record | Desmarais LLP 101 California St. Suite 3070 San Francisco, CA 94111 pmagic@desmaraisllp.com | 4155731899 |
Party name: Sound View Innovations, LLC | ||
Naveen Modi Counsel of Record | Paul Hastings LLP 2050 M Street, NW Washington, DC 20036 naveenmodi@paulhastings.com | 202-551-1990 |
Party name: VirnetX Inc. | ||
John Edward Roberts Counsel of Record | Proskauer Rose LLP One International Place Boston, MA 02110 jroberts@proskauer.com | 617.526.9813 |
Party name: Sanofi Pasteur Inc. and SK Chemicals Co., Ltd. | ||
Catherine Emily Stetson Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 13th Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20004-1109 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com | 2026375491 |
Party name: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001-5369 donald.verrilli@mto.com | 202-220-1101 |
Party name: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC | ||
David Jacob Zimmer Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter LLP 100 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com | 6175701000 |
Party name: Personalized Media Communications, LLC | ||
W. Cook Alciati | Gardell Grace, PA.. 80 M Street SE, 1st Floor Washington, DC 20003 calciati@gardellagrace.com | 703-721-8379 |
Party name: Steuben Foods, Inc. | ||
Arlene L Chow | Latham & Watkins LLP 885 Third Avenue New York, NY 10022 arlene.chow@lw.com | 212-906-1290 |
Party name: Amgen Inc. and Amgen Manufacturing Liited | ||
Anthony D. Del Monaco | Finnegen, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP 901 New York Ave. NW Washington, DC 20001-4413 anthony.delmonaco@finnegan.com | 202-408-4000 |
Party name: High 5 Games, LLC |