No. 20-737 | |
Title: | B/E Aerospace, Inc., Petitioner v. C&D Zodiac, Inc. |
Docketed: | November 27, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1935, 2019-1936) |
Decision Date: | June 26, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 23 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 04 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent C&D Zodiac, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 09 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer and Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Patrick J. Coyne Counsel of Record | Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP 901 New York Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20001-4413 | (202) 408-4000 |
Party name: B/E Aerospace, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
John Charles Alemanni Counsel of Record | Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP 4208 Six Forks Rd, Suite 1400 Raleigh, NC 27609 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com | 9194201724 |
Party name: C&D Zodiac, Inc. |