No. 20-733
Title:Terrill A. Rickmon, Sr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2054)
   Decision Date:March 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2020 to January 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2021.
Jan 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2021 to February 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Luke Verrill Cass
    Counsel of Record
Quarles & Brady LLP
1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

luke.cass@quarles.com
(202) 372-9600
Party name: Terrill A. Rickmon, Sr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States