No. 20-727
Title:Facebook, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Perrin Aikens Davis, et al.
Docketed:November 25, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17486)
   Decision Date:April 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2020 to February 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 11, 2021.
Dec 28 2020Brief amici curiae of Internet Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025-7019

jlfisher@omm.com
650-473-2633
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Perrin Aikens Davis, et al.
Other
Patrick Joseph Carome
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

patrick.carome@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6610
Party name: Internet Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Software and Information Industry Association, and Computer and Communications Industry Association