No. 20-72
Title:Janet L. Himsel, et al., Petitioners
v.
4/9 Livestock, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 24, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(18A-PL-645)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:July 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 20, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Katherine Anne Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Animal Law and Policy Clinic
1607 Massachusetts Ave.,
Cambridge, MA 02138

kmeyer@law.harvard.edu
617-998-2450
Party name: Janet Himsel, et al.