No. 20-718
Title:Mario Nelson Reyes-Romero, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 24, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1923)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2020 to January 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2021.
Jan 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 27, 2021 to February 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2021.
Feb 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2021 to March 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 26, 2021.
Mar 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 26, 2021 to April 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 23, 2021.
Apr 05 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Mario Nelson Reyes-Romero
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States