No. 20-690
Title:Michael Sang Han, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3081)
   Decision Date:June 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2020 to January 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2021.
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 18, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Franz King
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

kking@cov.com
2026625488
Party name: Michael Sang Han
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America