No. 20-685
Title:Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sierra Club, et al.
Docketed:November 17, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17501, 19-17502, 20-15044)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2020)
Certificate of Word CountPetition
Dec 02 2020Motion of the Sierra Club, et al. to extend the time to file a response from December 17, 2020 to January 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2020Motion of the State of California to extend the time to file a response from December 17, 2020 to January 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2020The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2021, for all respondents.
Dec 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rep. Andy Barr filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2021 to February 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 18, 2021, for all respondents.
Feb 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 18, 2021 to May 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 19, 2021, for all respondents.
May 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 19, 2021 to July 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 19, 2021, for all respondents.
Jul 19 2021Brief of respondents Sierra Club, Southern Border Communities Coalition in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Brief of respondents State of California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Reply of petitioners Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED with instructions to direct the District Court to vacate its judgments. The District Court should consider what further proceedings are necessary and appropriate in light of the changed circumstances in this case.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joshua A. Klein
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: State of California
Dror Ladin
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Fundation
125 Broad Street, Fl 18
New York, NY 10004

dladin@aclu.org
2122847303
Party name: Sierra Club, Southern Border Communities Coalition
Other
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Rep. Andy Barr