No. 20-666
Title:Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General, et al., Petitioners
v.
City and County of San Francisco, California, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-17308, 18-17311)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Nov 19 2020Motion of City and County of San Francisco to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2020Motion of State of California to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 20 2020The motions to extend the time to file responses to the peition for a writ of certiorari are granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2021, for all respondents.
Jan 13 2021Brief of respondents State of California ex rel. Xavier Becerra, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2021Brief of respondents City and County of San Francisco, California, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Jan 27 2021Letter from Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General, et al., received.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 22 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 04 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the case pursuant Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2021Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
City Hall, 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place, Room 234
San Francisco, CA 94102

sara.eisenberg@sfcityatty.org
415-554-4633
Party name: City and County of San Francisco, California, et al.
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6269
Party name: State of California ex rel. Xavier Becerra, Attorney General