No. 20-662
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Appellants
v.
Natalia Useche, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(8:20-cv-02225-PX-PAH-ELH)
   Decision Date:November 6, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2020Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
Jurisdictional StatementProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Letter of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion for Expedited Consideration of the Jurisdictional Statement and Waiver of the 14-day Waiting Period for Distribution filed by appellant Donald J. Trump, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, et al.