No. 20-660
Title:Employer Solutions Staffing Group, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-16493)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Rebecca J. Levine
    Counsel of Record
Rebecca Levine Law PLLC
5200 Willson Road
Suite 150
Edina, MN 55424

rlevine@rebeccalevinelaw.com
952-836-2711
Party name: Employer Solutions Staffing Group, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Eugene Scalia, Secretary of Labor