No. 20-66 | |
Title: | G&M Realty L.P., et al., Petitioners v. Maria Castillo, et al. |
Docketed: | July 24, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-498-cv, 18-538-cv) |
Decision Date: | February 20, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 20 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 07 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent Maria Castillo, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Scott E. Gant Counsel of Record | Boies Schiller Flexner LLP 1401 New York Ave., NW Washington, DC 20005 sgant@bsfllp.com | 202-237-2727 |
Party name: G&M Realty L.P., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Andrew Rozynski Counsel of Record | Eisenberg & Baum, LLP 24 Union Square East, 4th Floor New York, NY 10003 arozynski@eandblaw.com | 2123538700 |
Party name: Maria Castillo, et al. |