No. 20-659
Title:Larry Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Pagiel Clark, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-580)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2020Waiver of right of respondent Police Officer Pagiel Clark, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Dec 03 2020Response Requested. (Due January 4, 2021)
Dec 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 4, 2021 to February 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 3, 2021.
Jan 04 2021Brief amici curiae of National, State, and Local Civil Rights, Racial Justice, and Criminal Defense Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2021Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors, Department of Justice Officials, and Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2021Brief of respondents Police Officer Pagiel Clark, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2021Reply of petitioner Larry Thompson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 08 2021Petition GRANTED.
Mar 11 2021The order granting the petition for a writ of certiorari is amended as follows: The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Mar 24 2021Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 31 2021Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 4, 2021. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 16, 2021.
May 04 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Police Officer Pagiel Clark, Shield #28472, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 04 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Brief of petitioner Larry Thompson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Home School Legal Defense Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of National, State, and Local Civil Rights, Racial Justice, and Criminal Defense Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Prosecutors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of National Police Accountability Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of APA Watch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Boston University Center for Antiracist Research filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
501 H St. NE
Suite 275
Washington, DC 20002

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Larry Thompson
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
212-356-2500
Party name: Police Officer Pagiel Clark, Shield #28472, et al.
Devin Andrew SlackNew York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

dslack@law.nyc.gov
212-356-0817
Party name: Police Officer Pagiel Clark, Shield #28472, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: National, State, and Local Civil Rights, Racial Justice, and Criminal Defense Organizations
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Home School Legal Defense Association
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: APA Watch
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Stekloff LLP
2001 M Street NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonstekloff.com
2028474046
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Marisa Christina Maleck
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mmaleck@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, Cato Institute, New York Civil Liberties Union, and Rutherford Institute
Mary B. McCord
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection, Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

mbm7@georgetown.edu
202-661-6607
Party name: Current and Former Prosecutors, Department of Justice Officials, and Judges
Marie Leora Miller
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

mmiller@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Angela Ifeoma Onwuachi-Willig
    Counsel of Record
Boston University School of Law
765 Commonwealth Avenue
Boston, MA 02215

aow@bu.edu
(617) 353-3112
Party name: Boston University Center for Antiracist Research
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: National Police Accountability Project and Innocence Network
Matthew D. Slater
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
2112 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20037

mslater@cgsh.com
(202) 974-1500
Party name: Law Enforcement Action Partnership
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
(212) 965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.