No. 20-651
Title:Cook Children's Medical Center, Petitioner
v.
T. L., a Minor, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Second District
   Case Numbers:(02-20-00002-CV)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:October 16, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 14, 2020 to December 21, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 21, 2020
Nov 24 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Cook Children's Medical Center submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Cook Children's Medical Center
Attorneys for Respondents
Jillian Lee Schumacher
    Counsel of Record
Daniels & Tredennick, PLLC
6363 Woodway Drive, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77057

jillian@dtlawyers.com
713-917-0024
Party name: T.L., a Minor, and Mother, T.L., on her behalf