No. 20-641
Title:LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Katie Sieben, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2559)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2020 to January 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 24 2020Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: LSP Transmission Holdings, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Minnesota Attorney General
445 Minnesota Street
Suite 1100
Saint Paul, MN 55101

liz.kramer@ag.state.mn.us
6517571010
Party name: Katie Sieben, et al.