No. 20-640 | |
Title: | The Welsh Government, Petitioner v. Pablo Star Ltd., et al. |
Docketed: | November 10, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-1262) |
Decision Date: | June 8, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 05 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 23 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021. |
Jan 11 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Richard J. Oparil Counsel of Record | Arnall Golden Gregory LLP 1775 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20006 richard.oparil@agg.com | 2026774908 |
Party name: The Welsh Government |