No. 20-6387
Title:Darrin B. Woodard, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5009)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2020)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2020 to January 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2020Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 20, 2021. (Docket entry corrected 1/7/21)
Jan 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 20, 2021 to February 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 19, 2021.
Feb 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2021 to February 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 22, 2021.
Feb 22 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 01 2021Reply of petitioner Darrin B. Woodard filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/26/2021.
Mar 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shira Kieval
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
633 17th St., Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

shira.kieval@fd.org
(303) 294-7002
Party name: Darrin B. Woodard
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Due Process Institute