No. 20-637
Title:Darrell Hemphill, Petitioner
v.
New York
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(66 SSM 5)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 13 2020Waiver of right of respondent State of New York to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 18 2020Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2020)
Nov 18 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner Darrell Hemphill
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Dec 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2020 to February 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2021.
Dec 18 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2020Brief amici curiae of Evidence and Criminal Procedure Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2021 to March 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jan 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 1, 2021.
Mar 01 2021Brief of respondent State of New York in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/1/2021.
Mar 16 2021Reply of petitioner Darrell Hemphill filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Darrell Hemphill
Attorneys for Respondent
Noah Jeffrey Chamoy
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Bronx District Attorney
198 East 161 Street
Bronx, NY 10451

chamoyn@bronxda.nyc.gov
7188387142
Party name: State of New York
Other
Nicholas David Marais
    Counsel of Record
Keker, Van Nest & Peters, LLP
633 Battery Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

nmarais@keker.com
415-391-5400
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Evidence and Criminal Procedure Professors