No. 20-634
Title:Felicia Robinson, Petitioner
v.
Webster County, MIssissippi, et al.
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-60301)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020Waiver of right of respondent Sheriff Tim Mitchell, Individually to respond filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
William Robert Allen
    Counsel of Record
Allen, Allen, Breeland, & Allen, PLLC
214 Justice Street
Brookhaven, MS 39601

wallen@aabalegal.com
6018334361
Party name: Sheriff Tim Mitchell, Individually