No. 20-633
Title:Byron David Smith, Petitioner
v.
Jeff Titus, Warden
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2915)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Waiver of Byron Smith of right to respond not accepted for filing. (November 17, 2020)
Nov 19 2020Waiver of right of respondent Jeff Titus, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 15 2020Response Requested. (Due January 14, 2021)
Jan 14 2021Brief of respondent Jeff Titus, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Jay Meshbesher
    Counsel of Record
Meshbesher & Associates
9800 Shelard Pkwy #310
Minneapolis, MN 55441

steve@stevemeshbesher.com
6123322000
Party name: Byron Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Andrew Hydukovich
    Counsel of Record
Washington County Attorney's Office
15015 62nd Street North
Stillwater, MN 55082

nicholas.hydukovich@co.washington.mn.us
6514306115
Party name: Jeff Titus, Warden
Brent D. WartnerWashington County Attorney's Office
51015 62nd Street, P.O. Box 6
Stillwater, MN 55082-006

Brent.Wartner@co.washington.mn.us
651-430-6122
Party name: Jeff Titus, Warden