No. 20-631
Title:Hologic, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Minerva Surgical, Inc.
Docketed:November 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2054, 2019-2081)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:July 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2020Brief of Minerva Surgical, Inc. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew McManus Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

matthew.wolf@arnoldporter.com
2029425462
Party name: Hologic, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
(312) 853-2936
Party name: Minerva Surgical, Inc.