No. 20-622
Title:Amazon.com, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Bernadean Rittmann, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35381)
   Decision Date:August 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 25, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2020 to January 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 13, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Shannon Liss-Riordan
    Counsel of Record
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston Street
Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

sliss@llrlaw.com
6179945800
Party name: Bernadean Rittmann