No. 20-609
Title:Gannett Company, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Jeffrey Quatrone
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1212)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 22, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 04 2021Response Requested. (Due February 3, 2021)
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 3, 2021 to March 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2021.
Mar 05 2021Brief of respondent Jeffrey Quatrone in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2021Reply of petitioners Gannett Co., Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/16/2021.
Apr 19 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
(312) 853-7875
Party name: Gannett Co., Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Jeffrey Quatrone