No. 20-605
Title:Kiernan Wholean, et al., Petitioners
v.
CSEA SEIU Local 2001, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1563)
   Decision Date:April 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 02 2020Waiver of right of respondent CSEA SEIU Local 2001 to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Response Requested. (Due January 22, 2021)
Dec 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2021 to February 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 31 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2021, for all respondents.
Feb 19 2021Brief of respondent Connecticut in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021Brief of respondent CSEA SEIU Local 2001 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Milton L. Chappell
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Rd
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

mlc@nrtw.org
703-770-3329
Party name: Kiernan Wholean, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Clare E. Kindall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
165 Capitol Avenue
Hartford, CT 06106

Clare.Kindall@ct.gov
860-808-5261
Party name: Benjamin Barnes, et al.
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: CSEA SEIU Local 2001