No. 20-603
Title:Le Roy Torres, Petitioner
v.
Texas Department of Public Safety
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Texas, Thirteenth District
   Case Numbers:(13-17-00659-CV)
   Decision Date:November 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 19, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 5, 2020
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2020Waiver of right of respondent Texas Department of Public Safety to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 24 2020Response Requested. (Due December 28, 2020)
Dec 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2020 to January 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2021.
Dec 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jeffrey M. Hirsch filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Reserve Organization of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Philip C. Bobbitt, Michael C. Dorf, and H. Jefferson Powell filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 27 2021Brief of respondent Texas Department of Public Safety in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 10 2021Reply of petitioner Le Roy Torres filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2021The Acting Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 09 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Nov 23 2021Supplemental brief of petitioner Le Roy Torres filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 15 2021Petition GRANTED.
Dec 22 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Texas Department of Public Safety
Blanket Consent
Dec 29 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Le Roy Torres
Blanket Consent
Dec 30 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Le Roy Torres.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jan 26 2022Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Texas 13th District.
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, March 29, 2022.
Jan 31 2022The record received from the Court of Appeals of Texas 13th District is electronic and located on the Court of Appeals of Texas web site. Also one envelope containing the Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Record, and Reporter's Record.
Jan 31 2022Brief of petitioner Le Roy Torres filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Constitutional Law and The Law of Federal and State Courts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jeffrey M. Hirsch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of War Powers Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Reserve Organization of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Philip C. Bobbitt, Michael C. Dorf, and H. Jefferson Powell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Bipartisan Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 02 2022Brief of respondent Texas Department of Public Safety filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 03 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 09 2022Brief amici curiae of State of Montana and 14 Other States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Philip A. Pucillo filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Separation of Powers Clinic at Antonin Scalia Law School filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Mar 18 2022Reply of petitioner Le Roy Torres filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2022Argued. For petitioner: Andrew T. Tutt, Washington, D. C.; and Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.
Jun 29 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Sotomayor, Kagan, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., filed a concurring opinion. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, Gorsuch, and Barrett, JJ., joined.
Aug 01 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 01 2022MANDATE ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5000
Party name: Le Roy Torres
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas Department of Public Safety
Other
David Morgan Steven Dewhirst
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 201401
215 North Sanders
Helena, MT 59620-1401

David.Dewhirst@mt.gov
406-444-2026
Party name: State of Montana and 14 Other States
Brendan Benjamin Gants
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 500 E
Washington, DC 20001

brendan.gants@mto.com
202-220-1100
Party name: Philip C. Bobbitt, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Matthew James Dowd
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Scheffel PLLC
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 1025
Washington, DC 20006

mdowd@dowdscheffel.com
202-559-9175
Party name: Former Members of Congress
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Scholars of Constitutional Law and The Law of Federal and State Courts
Adele Marie El-Khouri
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

adele.el-khouri@mto.com
2022977027
Party name: Philip C. Bobbitt, Michael C. Dorf, and H. Jefferson Powell
Alec Winfield Farr
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
700 13th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

AFarr@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program, Iraq and Afghanistan Veterans of America, Paralyzed Veterans of America, Veterans of Foreign Wars, and Vietnam Veterans of America
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: Philip A. Pucillo
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Theodore Augustus Howard
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

thoward@wiley.law
(202) 719-7120
Party name: Reserve Organization of America
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Separation of Powers Clinic, Gray Center
Antonin Scalia Law School, George Mason University
3301 Fairfax Drive
Arlington, VA 22201

rmccotte@gmu.edu
202-706-5488
Party name: Separation of Powers Clinic at Antonin Scalia Law School
Matthew David Rowen
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20004

matthew.rowen@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: War Powers Scholars
Richard A. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
2050 M Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

rsimpson@wiley.law
202-719-7314
Party name: Professor Jeffrey M. Hirsch
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
713-572-4321
Party name: Bipartisan Members of Congress