No. 20-602
Title:Stephanie Clifford, aka Stormy Daniels, Petitioner
v.
Donald J. Trump
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56351)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mbilike Mackintosh Mwafulirwa
    Counsel of Record
Brewster & De Angelis
2617 E. 21st Street
Tulsa, OK 74114

mmm@brewsterlaw.com
918-742-2021
Party name: Stephanie Clifford