No. 20-601
Title:Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky, Petitioner
v.
EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5516)
   Decision Date:June 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2020 to February 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2021.
Dec 07 2020Brief amici curiae of The States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2021Brief of respondents EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 19 2021Reply of petitioner Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barry Lee Dunn
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue
Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

barry.dunn@ky.gov
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Daniel Cameron, Attorney General of Kentucky
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew David Beck
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

abeck@aclu.org
212-549-2633
Party name: EMW Women's Surgical Center, P.S.C., et al.
Other
Brunn Wall Roysden III
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 North Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

beau.roysden@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: The States of Arizona, Alabama, Alaska, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia