No. 20-60
Title:Sheldon Silver, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:July 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2380)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 21, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2020Waiver of right of respondent United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 27 2020Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2020)
Sep 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2020.
Oct 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2020 to October 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2020.
Oct 30 2020Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2020Reply of petitioner Sheldon Silver filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Dec 07 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/11/2020.
Jan 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/15/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Meir Feder
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281

mfeder@jonesday.com
2123263939
Party name: Sheldon Silver
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.