No. 20-5904
Title:Tarahrick Terry, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10482)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2020)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Oct 28 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2020 to December 4, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2020.
Dec 04 2020Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5. filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2020Reply of petitioner Tarahrick Terry filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 08 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

andrew_adler@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Tarahrick Terry
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States