No. 20-5724 | |
Title: | Justin Lamar Johnson, Petitioner v. Joseph Gibson, Judge, et al. |
Docketed: | September 16, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-3280) |
Decision Date: | July 22, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 11 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 16, 2020) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Sep 18 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Oct 29 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020. |
Nov 16 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
Nov 16 2020 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | |
Jan 27 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021. |
Feb 22 2021 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Justin Lamar Johnson | 1844 Brewster Creek Drive Akron, OH 44306 | |
Party name: Justin Johnson | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |