No. 20-564
Title:Rodney Carlisle, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Kentucky
Docketed:October 30, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2018-SC-000680-MR)
   Decision Date:May 28, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Nov 04 2020Waiver of right of respondent Kentucky to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 10 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020.
Nov 19 2020Response Requested. (Due December 21, 2020)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Rodney Carlisle, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
James Havey
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601

james.havey@ky.gov
5026965498
Party name: Kentucky