No. 20-561
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Appellants
v.
City of San Jose, California, et al.
Docketed:October 29, 2020
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Northern District of California
   Case Numbers:(20-CV-05167-RRC-LHK-EMC, 20-CV-05169-RRC-LHK-EMC)
   Decision Date:October 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 29 2020Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due November 30, 2020)
Jurisdictional StatementCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2020Letter of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. submitted.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion For Expedited consideration of the Jurisdictional Statement and Waiver of The 14-day Waiting period for Distribution filed by appellant Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 25 2020Motion of City of San Jose, California, et al. to affirm submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: City of San Jose, California, et al.