No. 20-554
Title:Craig Eugene Smith, Petitioner
v.
James McKinney, Warden, et al.
Docketed:October 27, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3613)
   Decision Date:March 31, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 26, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 22 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Craig Eugene Smith
Attorneys for Respondents
William Allen Hill
    Counsel of Record
Iowa Attorney General's Office
Hoover State Office Building
Des Moines, IA 50319

william.hill@ag.iowa.gov
(515)281-6162
Party name: James McKinney, et al.