No. 20-546
Title:Michigan, Petitioner
v.
Laricca Seminta Mathews
Docketed:October 26, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Michigan
   Case Numbers:(339079)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 12, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2020 to January 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondent
Joseph Alan Lavigne
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Joseph A. Lavigne
31700 West 13 Mile Road
Suite 96
Farmington Hills, MI 48334

joe@lavignelawoffices.com
248-539-3144
Party name: Laricca Seminta Mathews