No. 20-544
Vide 20-543
Title:Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, et al.
Docketed:October 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5204, 20-5205, 20-5209)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2020Brief amicus curiae of State of Alaska filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2020 to December 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2020, for all respondents.
Nov 18 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by US Senators Lisa Murkowski, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Alaska Federation of Natives filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 16 2020Brief of respondents Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, et al., et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020Brief of respondents Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2020Brief of respondents Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation in opposition filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5. filed.
Main Document
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Dec 23 2020Reply of petitioners Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by US Senators Lisa Murkowski, et al. GRANTED.
Jan 08 2021Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-543 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jan 08 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-543. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-543. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 12 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 19, 2021. VIDED.
Mar 15 2021Record requested.
Mar 16 2021The record received from the U.S. District and Bankruptcy Courts is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 16 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 30 2021CIRCULATED
Mar 31 2021Amicus brief of Professors and Historians not accepted for filing. (April 28, 2021--to be filed in lead case No. 20-543)
Apr 19 2021Argued. For petitioner in 20-543: Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For petitioners in 20-544: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen, Louisville, Colo. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Alaska Native Village Corporation Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicole E. Ducheneaux
    Counsel of Record
Big Fire Law & Policy Group, LLP
1404 Fort Crook Road South
Bellevue, NE 68005

nducheneaux@bigfirelaw.com
4064934693
Party name: Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, et al., et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury
Jeffrey Scott Rasmussen
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Earnhart Real Bird & Wilson LLP
1900 Plaza Drive
Louisville, CO 80027

jrasmussen@nativelawgroup.com
303-926-5292
Party name: Ute Indian Tribe of the Uintah and Ouray Reservation
Other
Colette Routel
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Hamline School of Law
875 Summit Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55105

colette.routel@mitchellhamline.edu
6512906327
Party name: Professors and Historians
Christine Victoria Williams
    Counsel of Record
Outlook Law, LLC
1016 West 6th Avenue
Suite 306
Anchorage, AK 99501

christinewilliams@outlooklaw.com
9072582200
Party name: US Senators Lisa Murkowski and Dan Sullivan, and US Congressman Don Young
James Hardwick Lister
    Counsel of Record
Birch Horton Bittner and Cherot, P.C.
1100 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 825
Washington, DC 20036

jlister@dc.bhb.com
2026595800
Party name: Alaska Federation of Natives
Laura Emily Wolff
    Counsel of Record
The State of Alaska
1031 4th Ave., Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

laura.wolff@alaska.gov
907-269-5100
Party name: State of Alaska