No. 20-539
Vide 20-429, 20-454
Title:Oregon, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.
Docketed:October 23, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15974, 19-35386)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:May 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.
Dec 04 2020Brief for the Federal Respondents filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 22 2020Reply of petitioners Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/8/2021.
Jan 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/22/2021.
Feb 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 22 2021Petition GRANTED. The petitions for writs of certiorari in Nos. 20-429 and 20-454 are granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Feb 22 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-429. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-429. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Mar 12 2021Joint stipulation to dismiss the cases in Nos. 20-429 and 20-539 pursuant to Rule 46.1 filed. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Oregon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al.