No. 20-535
Title:Drew Samuel Bates, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 22, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7061)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2020 to December 23, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 23, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Drew Samuel Bates
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States